Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ercole Vaccari

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
18 Feb 161969.1AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
12 Mar 161969.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
27 Jul 162474.5DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ercole Vaccari
Archbishop Ercole Vaccari (born 1550, died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 65, Number 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast