Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Maria Fistilli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1798Born
23 Dec 182022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rossano, Italy
6 Sep 184547.5SelectedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
24 Nov 184547.7ConfirmedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
7 Dec 184547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
26 Sep 184850.5ResignedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
1849¹50.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Maria Fistilli
Bishop Gregorio Maria Fistilli (born , died 1849) Bishop Emeritus of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRossano
Ordained BishopS. Caterina da Siena, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 47
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast