Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Rizzo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1890Born
22 Apr 191625.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 194655.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
28 May 194655.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysias
16 Jun 194655.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysias
13 Jan 194958.1AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
18 Nov 197181.0RetiredArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
13 Nov 198090.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rizzo
Archbishop Giovanni Rizzo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontedoro

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast