Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lelio Giordano

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1570AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
10 Aug 1570Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
28 Nov 1580AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
1581¹DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio Giordano (VIAF: 150736875)
Archbishop Lelio Giordano (died 1581) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286, and Page 93
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 17, Number 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast