Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Labonia, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montemarano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1638BornRossano
24 Sep 166122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
17 Nov 167032.0AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
23 Nov 167032.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
30 Mar 172081.3DiedBishop of Montemarano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Labonia:
Bishop Giuseppe Labonia O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Montemarano

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 274
  • bp/c34/d: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 10 Apr 2015