Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo della Noca, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornNapoli
18 Mar 167163.2AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
14 Dec 167567.9ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
9 Jul 169183.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Angelo della Noca:
Archbishop Angelo della Noca O.S.B. (born 1608, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015