Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of CittÓ di Castello

Dioecesis Civitatis Castelli o Tifernatensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luciano Paolucci Bedini, Bishop
  • Domenico Cancian, F.A.M., Bishop Emeritus

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
7th CenturyErectedDiocese of CittÓ di Castello (erected)
22 October 1938Territory AddedDiocese of CittÓ di Castello (Adjusted boundaries to match civil boundaries)
Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro) (Adjusted boundaries to match civil boundaries)
19 February 1962Territory LostDiocese of CittÓ di Castello (S. Maria alia Rassinata Parish) Diocese of Arezzo
15 August 1972Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of CittÓ di Castello (from Immediately Subject to Perugia)
19 March 1984Territory LostDiocese of CittÓ di Castello (S. Martino in Apecchio, S. Stefano in Baciocheto, Ss. Quirico from Giulitta in Caselle, S. Maria della Cella, S. Paolo in Fagnille, S. Stefano in Osteria Nuova, S. Martino del Piano, S. Lorenzo in Sessaglia (in Apecchio), and S. Andrea di Sorbello) Diocese of Cortona
29 June 1992Territory LostDiocese of CittÓ di Castello (San Liberato Abate e Martire in Narni) Diocese of Terni-Narni-Amelia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
188646,643.0%2110165OTC
195066,61866,71099.9%1201013051211249156ap1951
197063,64063,73099.9%10291115739251156ap1971
198059,71360,07599.4%859946359225158ap1981
199058,69558,74599.9%697767724920860ap1991
199958,70059,47298.7%59147380481418860ap2000
200058,70059,47298.7%621375782101318560ap2001
200158,71059,46398.7%611374793101617860ap2002
200258,72059,47298.7%661379743101617060ap2003
200358,83060,35697.5%641377764101416560ap2004
200458,84060,37097.5%641175784101316060ap2005
200658,90060,06098.1%60117182991113160ap2007
201362,60064,20097.5%501565963111813460ap2014
201662,80064,80096.9%4911601,046171313460ap2017
201962,50064,70096.6%457521,20121713160ap2020
202162,47064,70096.6%467531,17819813160ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 190, and Page 191
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 130
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 169
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 683, to Page 684
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 414, and Page 415
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 470, and Page 471
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 667, and Page 668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024