Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria Muscettola, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1666Born
23 Mar 168216.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
4 Jun 168923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
6 Dec 171751.7AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
12 Dec 171751.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
16 Apr 173872.0ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
28 Jan 174679.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Muscettola
Archbishop Francesco Maria Muscettola C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast