Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Spinola, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1664AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
28 Sep 1664Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
6 Jan 1671DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Spinola:
Archbishop Carlo Spinola O.S.M. (died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015