Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislao Poliastri

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1681BornCosenza
6 Jun 170524.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 173857.0AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
25 May 173857.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
30 Dec 176180.6ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
21 Mar 176381.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Poliastri:
Archbishop Stanislao Poliastri (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015