Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guglelmo Camaldari

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1705BornGallipoli
1 Feb 173125.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 176257.0AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
4 Apr 176257.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
22 Apr 177873.0DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglelmo Camaldari:
Archbishop Guglelmo Camaldari (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015