Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Compagnone

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1620Born
5 Feb 168565.0AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
11 Feb 168565.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
1 Nov 168767.7DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Compagnone
Archbishop Girolamo Compagnone (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAversa

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast