Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Montevideo

Archidioecesis Montisvidei



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 April 1897
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uruguay
  • Square Kilometers: 540 (208 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesis.net/
  • Mailing Address: Calle Treinta y Tres 1368, Casilla de Correo entral 356, 11000 Montevideo, Uruguay
  • Telephone: (02) 915-8127, 915-8879
  • Fax: 915-8926

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Montevideo
1830ErectedDiocese of Buenos Aires Vicariate Apostolic of Montevideo (erected)
Diocese of Montevideo
13 July 1878ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Montevideo Diocese of Montevideo
14 April 1897Territory LostDiocese of Montevideo Diocese of Salto (erected)
14 April 1897Territory LostDiocese of Montevideo Diocese of Melo (erected)
Archdiocese of Montevideo
14 April 1897ElevatedDiocese of Montevideo Archdiocese of Montevideo
15 November 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Montevideo
Diocese of Salto
Diocese of San José de Mayo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Montevideo
1950935,0001,345,00069.5%974505471,7095701,00082ap1951
1966900,0001,300,00069.2%602933532,5494571,10874ap1967
19701,215,0001,350,00090.0%692843533,4414541,34876ap1971
19761,305,0001,450,00090.0%792693483,75054381,20076ap1977
1980857,0001,260,00068.0%692323012,847932885476ap1981
1990906,0001,343,00067.5%763924681,935155511,02377ap1991
1999850,0001,350,00063.0%771962733,1132529297477ap2000
2000850,0001,350,00063.0%721902623,2442528588077ap2001
2001850,0001,350,00063.0%731872603,2692528278077ap2002
2002850,0001,350,00063.0%731852583,2942627869877ap2003
2003850,0001,350,00063.0%691802493,4132727164577ap2004
2004850,0001,350,00063.0%741702443,4832726163577ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 11 Feb 2014