Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Parteli Keller

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1910BornRivera
15 Apr 193323.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 196050.7AppointedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
27 Dec 196050.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
8 Jan 196150.8InstalledBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
26 Feb 196656.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
26 Feb 196656.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Turris in Mauretania
17 Nov 197666.7SucceededArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
5 Jun 198575.2RetiredArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
26 May 199989.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Carlos Parteli Keller:
Archbishop Carlos Parteli Keller (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 129
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013