Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Francisco Ferrería Paz

Bishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1953 BornMontevideo, Uruguay
16 Dec 198936.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 Dec 200754.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Dec 200754.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
22 Feb 200854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia
8 Jun 201158.0AppointedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Jul 201158.2InstalledBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Roberto Francisco Ferrería Paz:
Bishop Roberto Francisco Ferrería Paz (born ) Bishop of Campos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 1 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,679

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014