Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio César Bonino Bonino

Deceased

Bishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1947Born
26 May 197427.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 198942.8AppointedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
18 Mar 199043.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
8 Aug 201770.5DiedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Julio César Bonino Bonino (VIAF: 309740190)
Bishop Julio César Bonino Bonino (born , died ) Bishop of Tacuarembó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Lucía
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tacuarembó, Diocese of Tacuarembó
Death PlaceTacuarembó, Diocese of Tacuarembó

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,061
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast