Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Jaime Galimberti di Vietri

Bishop of Salto, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1941 Born
29 May 197130.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 198342.5AppointedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
18 Mar 198442.8Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
16 May 200665.0AppointedBishop of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Pablo Jaime Galimberti di Vietri
Bishop Pablo Jaime Galimberti di Vietri (born ) Bishop of Salto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 May 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast