Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Lorenzo Cabrera Urdangarin

Deceased

Bishop of Mercedes, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1900Born
19 Dec 192525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
31 Dec 196060.3AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay
11 Feb 196160.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay
23 May 197473.7DiedBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Enrico Lorenzo Cabrera Urdangarin
Bishop Enrico Lorenzo Cabrera Urdangarin (born , died ) Bishop of Mercedes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de Mayo

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast