Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis del Castillo Estrada, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Melo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1931 BornMontevideo
30 Jul 196635.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Apr 198856.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
9 Apr 198856.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Numidia
11 Jun 198857.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Numidia
21 Dec 199968.5AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
13 Jun 200978.0RetiredBishop of Melo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Luis del Castillo Estrada:
Bishop Luis del Castillo Estrada S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Melo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013