Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Balaguer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tacuarembó, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1906Born
26 Oct 193024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
20 Nov 196256.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
20 Nov 196256.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
6 Jan 196356.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
26 Feb 196659.4AppointedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
28 Jan 198376.3ResignedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
15 Oct 198579.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tacuarembó, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Miguel Balaguer
Bishop Miguel Balaguer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tacuarembó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocha

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast