Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Pablo Pérez Scremini

Bishop of Florida, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1949 Born
14 Jun 198535.4Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
6 Mar 200454.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
6 Mar 200454.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari
25 Apr 200454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari
15 Mar 200858.2AppointedBishop of Florida, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Martín Pablo Pérez Scremini
Bishop Martín Pablo Pérez Scremini (born ) Bishop of Florida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Florida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,580
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast