Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Horacio Scarrone Carrero

Bishop Emeritus of Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1931 BornMontevideo
24 Sep 195524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
13 Oct 198251.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
13 Oct 198251.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
12 Dec 198251.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
15 Jun 198756.1AppointedBishop of Florida, Uruguay
15 Mar 200876.9RetiredBishop of Florida, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Raúl Horacio Scarrone Carrero:
Bishop Raúl Horacio Scarrone Carrero (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Florida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Florida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015