Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio María (Alfredo) Cardinal Barbieri, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1892BornMontevideo
1916²23.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Dec 192129.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Oct 193643.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
6 Oct 193643.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Macra
8 Nov 193644.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Macra
20 Nov 194048.1SucceededArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
15 Dec 195866.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195866.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
17 Nov 197684.0RetiredArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
6 Jul 197986.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montevideo, Uruguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María (Alfredo) Barbieri:
Antonio María (Alfredo) Cardinal Barbieri O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 80
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015