Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Isaza y Goyechea

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1847Born
21 Dec 187225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
17 Feb 189144.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
17 Feb 189144.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
31 May 189144.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
19 Jul 191871.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
28 Jun 192982.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Isaza y Goyechea
Archbishop Ricardo Isaza y Goyechea (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Diocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Diocese of Montevideo

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017