Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Florida

Dioecesis Floridensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 15 November 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Montevideo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uruguay
  • Square Kilometers: 22,600 (8,729 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Calle Alejandro Gallinal 532, 94000 Florida, Uruguay
  • Telephone: (035)22164
  • Fax: 23863

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Melo
14 April 1897ErectedDiocese of Montevideo Diocese of Melo (erected)
Diocese of Florida-Melo
11 August 1931Name ChangedDiocese of Melo Diocese of Florida-Melo
Diocese of Florida
15 November 1955SplitDiocese of Florida-Melo Diocese of Florida
Diocese of Melo
22 October 1960Territory LostDiocese of Florida Diocese of Tacuarembó (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Florida-Melo
1950500,000.0%22325403812828ap1951
Diocese of Florida
1966100,000119,29583.8%1713303,3332311315ap1967
1970100,000119,29583.8%1613293,448139316ap1971
1976100,000119,29583.8%1113244,166247316ap1977
1980101,600124,00081.9%1015254,064437516ap1981
199060,000100,00060.0%813212,8571214616ap1991
1999103,895122,22985.0%1118293,5821345716ap2000
200061,050122,22949.9%1018282,1801235716ap2001
200190,000122,60073.4%1119303,0001245216ap2002
200290,000122,22973.6%920293,1031255216ap2003
200390,000122,60073.4%1118293,1031235516ap2004
200490,000122,60073.4%1314273,3331216116ap2005
200691,000123,80073.5%1316293,1371276216ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013