Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Muzzolón, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco Paraguayo

Titular Bishop of Tyriaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1898BornPeñarol
12 Jun 192527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Mar 194850.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
11 Mar 194850.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tyriaeum
23 May 194850.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tyriaeum
6 Mar 196971.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
27 Oct 198486.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Ángel Muzzolón:
Bishop Ángel Muzzolón S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco Paraguayo

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 50
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1982, Page 848
  • op: CB, 5 Mar 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013