Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Francisco María Sanguinetti Montero

Bishop Emeritus of Canelones, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1945 Born
18 May 197327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
23 Feb 201064.3AppointedBishop of Canelones, Uruguay
20 Mar 201064.4Ordained BishopBishop of Canelones, Uruguay
19 Mar 202175.4RetiredBishop of Canelones, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Alberto Francisco María Sanguinetti Montero
Bishop Alberto Francisco María Sanguinetti Montero (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Canelones

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopOpen Air, In Front of, Nuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Cathedral, Canelones, Diocese of Canelones

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Canelones.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,596
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast