Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolás Cotugno Fanizzi, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1938 BornSesto San Giovanni, Italy
196223.3ProfessedPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jul 196728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Jun 199657.7AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
28 Jul 199657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Melo, Uruguay
4 Dec 199860.2AppointedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
11 Feb 201475.4RetiredArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Cotugno Fanizzi:
Archbishop Nicolás Cotugno Fanizzi S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Montevideo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,777
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 11 Feb 2014