Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Daniel Fernando Cardinal Sturla Berhouet, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Montevideo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Galla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1959 BornMontevideo
31 Jan 198020.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Nov 198728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Dec 201152.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
10 Dec 201152.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
4 Mar 201252.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes
11 Feb 201454.6AppointedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
14 Feb 201555.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201555.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Galla

MicroData Summary for Daniel Fernando Sturla Berhouet:
Daniel Fernando Cardinal Sturla Berhouet S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Montevideo

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Montevideo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Dec 2011
  • c34: CB, 17 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,271
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015