Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés María Rubio Garcia, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mercedes, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1924Born
11 Sep 194925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 May 196843.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
18 May 196843.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Traiani
29 Jun 196844.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Traiani
22 May 197550.9AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay
14 Feb 199570.7ResignedBishop of Mercedes, Uruguay
19 Apr 200681.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mercedes, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Andrés María Rubio Garcia
Bishop Andrés María Rubio Garcia S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mercedes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocha
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast