Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Salto

Dioecesis Saltensis in Uruguay



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
14 April 1897ErectedDiocese of Montevideo Diocese of Salto (erected)
15 November 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Montevideo
Diocese of Salto
Diocese of San José de Mayo (erected)
17 December 1960Territory LostDiocese of Salto
Diocese of San José de Mayo
Diocese of Mercedes (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950450,000500,00090.0%3328617,3775018520ap1951
1965255,000278,00091.7%3228604,2501614315ap1967
1970253,000280,00090.4%2330534,773419214ap1971
1976275,000290,00094.8%1716338,333219215ap1977
1980293,000319,00091.8%1926456,511329416ap1981
1990351,000375,00093.6%3021516,882257716ap1991
1999292,000320,00091.3%2316397,487198716ap2000
2000290,000320,00090.6%2017377,837208715ap2001
2001290,000320,00090.6%2016368,055198715ap2002
2002290,000320,00090.6%2116377,837179016ap2003
2003290,000320,00090.6%1713309,666175916ap2004
2004320,000355,90089.9%16153110,322197216ap2005
2010288,000379,59575.9%1617338,7275215716ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013