Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Francisco Aragone

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1883BornCarmelo
28 Oct 190825.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 191936.1AppointedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
9 Nov 191936.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
20 Nov 194057.5ResignedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
20 Nov 194057.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
7 May 195370.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Aragone:
Archbishop Juan Francisco Aragone (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montevideo

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013