Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Corso

Deceased

Bishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1916BornSan Ramón
29 Oct 193923.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 195842.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
30 Jul 195842.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Moglaena
28 Oct 195842.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Moglaena
26 Feb 196649.9AppointedBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay
25 Mar 198569.0DiedBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Antonio Corso:
Bishop Antonio Corso (born , died ) Bishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013