Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Paternain, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Florida

Titular Archbishop of Achrida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1894BornMinas
1 May 191722.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Feb 192126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Apr 192934.4AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
21 Jul 192934.7Ordained BishopBishop of Melo, Uruguay
27 Feb 196065.3ResignedBishop of Florida, Uruguay
27 Feb 196065.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
21 Sep 196065.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
19 Oct 197075.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Florida, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Miguel Paternain:
Archbishop Miguel Paternain C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Florida

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013