Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Maria Yereguj

Deceased

Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1833Born
18 Dec 185825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
13 May 188147.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
13 May 188147.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
18 Sep 188148.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
22 Nov 188148.3AppointedBishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
1 Feb 189056.5DiedBishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Maria Yereguj
Bishop Innocenzo Maria Yereguj (born , died ) Bishop of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Diocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Diocese of Montevideo

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2/d: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast