Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmondo Quaglia Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Minas, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1907Born
30 Nov 193124.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 196457.3AppointedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
25 Jul 196457.4Ordained BishopBishop of Minas, Uruguay
12 Jul 197669.4DiedBishop of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Edmondo Quaglia Martínez
Bishop Edmondo Quaglia Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndia Muerta

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast