Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato

Dioecesis Spediensis-Sarzanensis-Brugnatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luigi Ernesto Palletti, Bishop
  • Bassano Staffieri, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 881 (340 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Liguria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesilaspezia.it/
  • Mailing Address: Via Don Giovanni Minzoni 64, C.P. 215, 19121 La Spezia, Italia
  • Telephone: 0187.73.44.24
  • Fax: 0187.73.21.87

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Luni
465ErectedDiocese of Luni (erected)
Diocese of Luni e Sarzana
21 July 1465UnitedDiocese of Luni
Diocese of Sarzana
Diocese of Luni e Sarzana
Diocese of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato
25 November 1820UnitedDiocese of Brugnato
Diocese of Luni e Sarzana
Diocese of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato
Diocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
12 January 1929Name ChangedDiocese of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato Diocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
Diocese of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
4 August 1975Name ChangedDiocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato Diocese of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
Diocese of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato Diocese of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
1950243,200245,26699.2%21683299813122492150ap1951
1970243,825247,66798.4%2238230579995420189ap1971
Diocese of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
1980245,600249,60098.4%18499283867119404192ap1981
Diocese of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato
1990227,875232,17698.1%155472021,128954325188ap1991
1999221,318223,66898.9%129481771,2502150229188ap2000
2000221,118223,56598.9%126451711,2932445230186ap2001
2001220,942223,63898.8%124431671,3232443229186ap2002
2002218,889221,27498.9%119451641,3342447195186ap2003
2003212,726215,13798.9%117481651,2892350191186ap2004
2004213,451215,93598.8%111481591,3422349187186ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 26 Jun 2013