Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bracelli

Deceased

Bishop of Luni e Sarzana


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1572AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
4 Jul 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
17 Apr 1590DiedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bracelli:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bracelli (died ) Bishop of Luni e Sarzana

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 19, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013