Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Righetti

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1843Born
31 Mar 186622.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189148.1AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
20 Dec 189148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
6 Jun 192480.6DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Righetti (VIAF: 89366054)
Bishop Andrea Righetti (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornice, Diocese of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato
Ordained BishopDames du Sacre Coeur, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Carpi, Diocese of Carpi

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast