Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maverna

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1920Born
19 Jun 194322.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 196545.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
15 Sep 196545.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vannida
17 Oct 196545.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vannida
9 Sep 197151.1AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
22 Feb 197352.6ResignedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
25 Mar 198261.7AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
25 Mar 198261.7AppointedBishop of Comacchio (-Pomposa), Italy
30 Sep 198666.2AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
8 Sep 199575.1RetiredArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
1 Jun 199877.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maverna
Archbishop Luigi Maverna (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLandriano

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast