Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Rossi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1826BornDiano Sarrata
1 Nov 184519.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 184822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Aug 188155.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
11 Sep 188155.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
18 Nov 188155.7AppointedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
29 Jan 189972.9DiedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Rossi:
Bishop Giacinto Rossi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 341, and Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013