Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Spinola, B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luni e Sarzana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1645BornGenova
6 Jun 170155.7AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
12 Jun 170155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
10 Mar 171064.5AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
29 Jun 172680.8ResignedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
21 Dec 172782.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Spinola:
Bishop Ambrogio Spinola B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luni e Sarzana

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250, and Page 410
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 7 May 2015