Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Gentile

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luni e Sarzana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1720BornGenova
30 Mar 175433.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 176746.6AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
6 Sep 176746.7Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
26 Sep 179170.7AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
17 Sep 179574.7ResignedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Gentile:
Bishop Francesco Maria Gentile (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Luni e Sarzana

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1783
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 132, and Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015