Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Antonio Cardinal Zacchia Rondinini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1787Born
22 Jul 184457.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Apr 184558.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 184558.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
26 Nov 184558.7DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Zacchia Rondinini (VIAF: 89644942)
Giuseppe Antonio Cardinal Zacchia Rondinini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVezzano, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast