Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Agnini

Deceased

Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1781BornGenova
26 Jul 180422.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 183655.2SelectedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
19 May 183755.6ConfirmedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
21 May 183755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
8 Mar 185371.4DiedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Agnini (VIAF: 88964743)
Bishop Francesco Agnini (born , died ) Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1847
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 246
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016