Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Guerra

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1650³Born
16 Jun 167525.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 170857.9AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
20 May 170857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Mar 172978.8DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Guerra
Bishop Giuseppe Guerra (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassa, Diocese of Luni e Sarzana
Ordained BishopSan Crisogono, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Lorenzo in Lucina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 19
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast