Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Stella

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1898BornGrumolo Pedemonte (Zugliano)
15 Jul 192324.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 194345.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
13 Nov 194345.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
6 Jan 194445.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
7 Sep 194547.0AppointedBishop of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
3 Sep 197577.0RetiredBishop of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
10 Sep 198991.0DiedBishop Emeritus of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Stella:
Bishop Giuseppe Stella (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1944, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013