Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Cesare Lomellino, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Luni e Sarzana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1701¹BornGenova
23 Sep 172423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 May 175756.3AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
30 May 175756.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
24 Feb 179190.1DiedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Lomellino:
Bishop Giulio Cesare Lomellino C.R. (born 1701, died ) Bishop of Luni e Sarzana

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1783
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Nov 2015