Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Pizzorno

Deceased

Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1861BornVarazze
1884¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Savona e Noli, Italy
29 Apr 190947.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sassari, Italy
29 Apr 190947.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
6 Jun 190947.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
14 Jan 191149.2AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
6 Dec 191554.1ResignedBishop of Crema, Italy
6 Dec 191554.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
7 Mar 192159.4AppointedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
6 Aug 192664.8DiedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Pizzorno:
Bishop Bernardo Pizzorno (born , died ) Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013