Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Righetti

Deceased

Bishop of Savona e Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1868Born
19 Sep 189123.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 191445.7AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
10 May 191445.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
9 Nov 191446.4InstalledBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
20 Dec 192658.5AppointedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
8 May 192758.9InstalledBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
7 Jul 194880.1DiedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Righetti
Bishop Pasquale Righetti (born , died ) Bishop of Savona e Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornice

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast